Cleveland v. FirstFleet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brieona Cleveland
Defendant: Rex Blackwell and FirstFleet, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00199
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brieona Cleveland. (McCarthy, Timothy)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian H. Stephenson on behalf of Rex Blackwell, FirstFleet, Inc. (Stephenson, Brian)
May 18, 2021 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rex Blackwell, FirstFleet, Inc.. (Zipperle, Gene)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand Case back to Jefferson Circuit Court filed by Rex Blackwell, FirstFleet, Inc.. (Zipperle, Gene)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand Case back to Jefferson Circuit Court by Plaintiff Brieona Cleveland (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (McCarthy, Timothy)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 4/5/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Telephonic Status Conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744. cc: counsel (JM)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 4/2/2021. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to withdraw the appearance of counsel Emily K. Holt. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (JM)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Lindsay may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Plaintiff Brieona Cleveland (McCarthy, Timothy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent FirstFleet Enterprises, Inc. for FirstFleet, Inc. (MNM)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rex Blackwell and FirstFleet, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-001063 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3314939). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer Filed in State Court, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland v. FirstFleet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Blackwell
Represented By: Gene F. Zipperle, Jr.
Represented By: Brian H. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstFleet, Inc.
Represented By: Gene F. Zipperle, Jr.
Represented By: Brian H. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brieona Cleveland
Represented By: Emily K. Holt
Represented By: Timothy R. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?