Ortiz Berbey v. Kit et al
Plaintiff: Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey
Defendant: Highland Student Housing Holdings, LLC, Everest Campus Services Company, LLC, Peak Campus Companies, LLC, HRB Louisville LLC, Everest Campus Centra, LLC, Peak Campus Management, LLC and Gary Kit, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00213
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 5/13/2021; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2887606. cc: counsel (JM)
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Everest Campus Centra, LLC, Everest Campus Services Company, LLC, Highland Student Housing Holdings, LLC, Peak Campus Companies, LLC, Peak Campus Management, LLC. (Pearson, Marcia)
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HRB Louisville LLC. (Alcott, Mark)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by HRB Louisville LLC. (Alcott, Mark)
May 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia L. Pearson on behalf of Everest Campus Centra, LLC, Everest Campus Services Company, LLC, Highland Student Housing Holdings, LLC, Peak Campus Companies, LLC, Peak Campus Management, LLC (Pearson, Marcia)
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Everest Campus Centra, LLC, Everest Campus Services Company, LLC, Highland Student Housing Holdings, LLC, Peak Campus Companies, LLC, Peak Campus Management, LLC. (Piekarski, Christopher)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey. HRB Louisville LLC served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Edwards, Blake)
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey. (Edwards, Blake)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey. Peak Campus Companies, LLC served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Edwards, Blake)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey. Highland Student Housing Holdings, LLC served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Edwards, Blake)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey. Everest Campus Centra, LLC served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Edwards, Blake)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey Proof of Service on Peak Campus Companies, LLC, Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to Peak Campus Company, LLC. (Edwards, Blake)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey Proof of Service on Peak Campus Management, LLC (Edwards, Blake)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey Proof of Service on Highland Student Housing Holdings, LLC (Edwards, Blake)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey re #3 Summons Issued, Proof of Service on Everest Campus Central, LLC (Edwards, Blake)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Edwards may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Everest Campus Centra, LLC, Everest Campus Services Company, LLC, HRB Louisville LLC, Highland Student Housing Holdings, LLC, Gary Kit, Jr., Peak Campus Companies, LLC, Peak Campus Management, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (KJA)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (KJA)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Everest Campus Centra, LLC, Everest Campus Services Company, LLC, HRB Louisville LLC, Highland Student Housing Holdings, LLC, Gary Kit, Jr., Peak Campus Companies, LLC, Peak Campus Management, LLC, filed by Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3318568. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz Berbey v. Kit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Student Housing Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Piekarski
Represented By: Marcia L. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Campus Services Company, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Piekarski
Represented By: Marcia L. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Campus Companies, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Piekarski
Represented By: Marcia L. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRB Louisville LLC
Represented By: Mark David Alcott
Represented By: Justin Lee Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Campus Centra, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Piekarski
Represented By: Marcia L. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Campus Management, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Piekarski
Represented By: Marcia L. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kit, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Yelena Ortiz Berbey
Represented By: Blake Van Edwards
Represented By: Daniel I. Wenig
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?