Raikes v. Nelson County Fiscal Court
Plaintiff: Jessica Raikes
Defendant: Nelson County Fiscal Court
Case Number: 3:2021cv00238
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/2/2021; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel,CM-CHL. (ARM)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Watson on behalf of Nelson County Fiscal Court (Watson, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. McKiernan, III on behalf of Nelson County Fiscal Court (McKiernan, James)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nelson County Fiscal Court. (Effinger, Cynthia)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nelson County Fiscal Court. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (MNM)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nelson County Fiscal Court, filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3324715, filed by Jessica Raikes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Job Description, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raikes v. Nelson County Fiscal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Raikes
Represented By: Tyler Z. Korus
Represented By: Robert L. Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson County Fiscal Court
Represented By: Robert T. Watson
Represented By: James E. McKiernan, III
Represented By: Cynthia L. Effinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?