Cooke-Banks et al v. Hanging Rock LTC, LLC
Plaintiff: Rosie Cooke-Banks
Defendant: Hanging Rock LTC, LLC doing business as Essex Nursing and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00272
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/1/2021; due to a scheduling error, the final pretrial conference is now scheduled--Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2023 01:30 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (ARM)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER (EBOC) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/25/2021. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 7/7/2021. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 7/7/2021. Fact Discovery due by 9/7/2022. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 7/7/2022. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 9/7/2022. Expert Discovery due by 11/7/2022. Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2022. Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due by 12/7/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2023 at 1:30 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (See Scheduling Order for all Pretrial Conference deadlines.) Jury Trial set for 7/10/2023 at 9:30 AM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. To participate in the conference, counsel shall use the following dial in information: 1-888-808-6929, Access Code 2887606. (Review Scheduling Order in full for specifics.) cc: Counsel; Jury Administrator (CDF)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hanging Rock LTC, LLC. (Miller, Byron)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 5/5/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 6/25/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. To participate in the conference, counsel shall use the following dial in information: 1-888-808-6929, Access Code 2887606. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/5/2021; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel CM-RSE. (ARM)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court Clerk (SRH)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanging Rock LTC, LLC. (SRH)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand, by Hanging Rock LTC, LLC. (SRH)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hanging Rock LTC, LLC, from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-002023. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3334880). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A- state court record, #3 Notice and Certificate of Removal, #4 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooke-Banks et al v. Hanging Rock LTC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanging Rock LTC, LLC doing business as Essex Nursing and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Adam B. Shadburne
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Cooke-Banks
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?