Fugate v. State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Shawn S. Fugate
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company and State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00274
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017-2018 Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 2018-2019 Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Commercial Property Conditions, #4 Proposed Order) (Langdon, Douglas)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Ohio Security Insurance Company COMPLETED on 6/4/2021. Secretary of State return states 5/18/2021. (SMJ)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Adanick, Perry)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/4/2021 granting #7 Proposed Agreed Order. Ohio Security shall have until on or before 6/30/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order For Extension of Time to Answer by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Wells, John)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company COMPLETED on 5/26/2021. Secretary of State return states 5/17/2021. (SMJ)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn S. Fugate. State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Returned Receipt) (Scott, Clinton)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn S. Fugate. Ohio Security Insurance Company served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Returned Receipt) (Scott, Clinton)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ohio Security Insurance Company and State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. Attested copy of Complaint emailed to counsel. (SRH)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Shawn S. Fugate, Executor of the Estate of Flora Mattingly, against Ohio Security Insurance Company and State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3335566. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Ohio Security, #2 Exhibit B- State Auto, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fugate v. State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Represented By: Laura M. Haara
Represented By: John Kendrick Wells, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carmen C. Sarge
Represented By: Perry A. Adanick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn S. Fugate
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?