Marcum et al v. PNC Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Sandra M. Smithers, Joel Todd Marcum and Carla M. Deddens
Defendant: C. Robert Marcum, Rob and PNC Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2021cv00289
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joel Todd Marcum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joel Todd Marcum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/22/2021 granting #10 Proposed Agreed Order. Plaintiffs shall have to and including 7/8/2021 to serve a Response to the Motions To Dismiss filed by PNC Bank, National Association, and C. Robert Marcum. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order by Joel Todd Marcum. (Bohnert, Kenneth)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen C. Tranter on behalf of C. Robert Marcum (Tranter, Kathleen)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant C. Robert Marcum (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Wicker, Kent)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter and attachments to Joel Todd Marcum (Marital), #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter and attachments to Joel Todd Marcum (Residuary), #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to Carla Deddens (Marital), #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter to Carla Deddens (Residuary), #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to Sandra Smithers (Marital), #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter to Sandra Smithers (Residuary), #7 Proposed Order) (Tachau, David)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike and Substitute #1 Notice of Removal,. Document or Part to be Stricken and/or Substituted: DN 1-1 (Exhibit A- State Court Record) by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted State Court Record, #2 Proposed Order) (Tachau, David)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/12/2021 re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant-PNC Bank and C. Robert Marcum filed a document (DN #1 , Exhibit 1) which contains personal data identifier(s). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to RESTRICT electronic access to this document (DN #1 - Exhibit 1) to Court users and participants in the case. Counsel shall jointly file a motion to seal the document or a motion seeking leave to file a redacted version of the document along with a copy of the redacted version within 7 days of the entry date of this Order. If counsel files a motion seeking leave to file a redacted version of the document, the motion will be GRANTED, and the Clerk will replace the document containing personal identifiers with the redacted version. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court Clerk (SRH)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for PNC Bank, National Association. (SRH)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, by PNC Bank, National Association and C. Robert Marcum, from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-002273. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3339919). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- state court record, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Removal - state court, #3 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcum et al v. PNC Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Robert Marcum
Represented By: Kathleen C. Tranter
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob
Represented By: Kathleen C. Tranter
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Katherine L. Crosby
Represented By: David B. Tachau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra M. Smithers
Represented By: Maureen P. Taylor
Represented By: Kenneth A. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Todd Marcum
Represented By: Maureen P. Taylor
Represented By: Kenneth A. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla M. Deddens
Represented By: Maureen P. Taylor
Represented By: Kenneth A. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?