D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc. v. NorVap International, Ltd.
Plaintiff: D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc. doing business as Avante Medical Surgical
Defendant: NorVap International, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00372
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Notice of SUMMONS Executed by D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc. (See DN #9 to view PDF document.) NorVap International, Ltd. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (CDF)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc. re #3 Summons Issued to Norvap International, Ltd. (Marcus, Aaron)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 7/19/2021 granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cody N. Wood. cc: Counsel (CDF)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 7/19/2021 granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brian P. Baggott. cc: Counsel (CDF)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Cody Nicklaus Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3382210. by Plaintiff D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Marcus, Aaron)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Brian Patrick Baggott to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3382177. by Plaintiff D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Marcus, Aaron)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NorVap International, Ltd.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc.. (JWM)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NorVap International, Ltd., filed by D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3359356. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc. v. NorVap International, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorVap International, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R.E. Medical Group, Inc. doing business as Avante Medical Surgical
Represented By: Cody N. Wood
Represented By: Brian P. Baggott
Represented By: Aaron W. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?