Zingg v. Ensite USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald Zingg
Defendant: Ensite USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00388
Filed: June 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 021
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Defer by Defendant Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sheller, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1) - Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit A (part 2) - Motion to Consolidate, #3 Exhibit A (part 3) - Motion to Consolidate, #4 Exhibit A (part 4) - Motion to Consolidate, #5 Exhibit A (part 5) - Motion to Consolidate) (Sheller, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/2/2021 granting #13 Proposed Agreed Order. EnSite's deadline to file its response to the Complaint is 8/4/2021. cc: Counsel (DLW)
July 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah B. Kembel on behalf of Ensite USA, Inc. (Kembel, Hannah)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John O. Sheller on behalf of Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ronald Zingg. (Burch, Richard)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 7/15/2021 granting #10 Motion for Frank J. Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #11 Motion for Joseph A. Fitapelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Joseph A. Fitapelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3380817) by Plaintiff Ronald Zingg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Burch, Richard)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Frank J. Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3380810) by Plaintiff Ronald Zingg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Burch, Richard)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Zingg. Ensite USA, Inc. served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Burch, Richard)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 7/6/2021 granting #7 Motion for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3373436) by Plaintiff Ronald Zingg (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Burch, Richard)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Richard J. Burch re Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/9/2021. (KJA)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joseph A. Fitapelli re Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/13/2021. (KJA)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Frank J. Mazzaferro re Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/13/2021. (KJA)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ensite USA, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
June 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ensite USA, Inc. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3362075, filed by Ronald Zingg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Handbook Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Tolling, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zingg v. Ensite USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensite USA, Inc.
Represented By: Don Fogel
Represented By: Hannah B. Kembel
Represented By: John T. Hays
Represented By: John O. Sheller
Represented By: Marlene C. Williams
Represented By: Scott R. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Zingg
Represented By: Frank J. Mazzaferro
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?