Dunson v. Lyons
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Dunson
Defendant: Christina C. Lyons
Case Number: 3:2021cv00413
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing fee: $ 52.00, receipt number L33067509 as ordered see DN 5 by Mark Anthony Dunson. (Ferguson, Kim)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Beaton on 7/152021. The Court DENIES the Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees (DN #3 ). Plaintiff to pay the $52 administrative fee within 30 days of entry of this Order. cc: Plaintiff (pro se) (JM)
July 8, 2021 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number L33067328 by Mark Anthony Dunson. (Ferguson, Kim)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Anthony Dunson (MNM)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mark Anthony Dunson (MNM)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christina C. Lyons, filed by Mark A. Dunson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2021: #2 Attachments to Complaint) (MNM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunson v. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Dunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina C. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?