Robbins v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Cristie Robbins
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00428
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cristie Robbins. (Korus, Tyler)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 8/12/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2887606. cc: counsel (JM)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Walgreen Co.. (Rusie, Jennifer)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 7/8/2021. The Court GRANTS the Defendant's proposed agreed order (DN #4 ) and extends the deadline by which it may file a responsive pleading to 7/23/2021. cc: Counsel (JM)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Edwards may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Walgreen Co.. (Rusie, Jennifer)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreen Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-003154 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3374748). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Rusie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristie Robbins
Represented By: Tyler Z. Korus
Represented By: Robert L. Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?