Hillje v. Hardin County Board of Education
Plaintiff: Wendy Hillje
Defendant: Hardin County Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2021cv00434
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hardin County Board of Education. (Priest, W.)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 7/28/2021; Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 10:15 AM ET before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. No cell phone participation will be permitted. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) by 8/19/2021 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 9/2/2021. (Review Order in full for specifics.) cc: Counsel; TB (CDF)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 7/27/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; TLB (TJD)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hardin County Board of Education. (Priest, W.) Modified to add jury demand on 7/28/2021 (CDF).
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (CDF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT & JURY DEMAND against Hardin County Board of Education, filed by Wendy Hillje. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3375695.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillje v. Hardin County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Hillje
Represented By: Bernard R. Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardin County Board of Education
Represented By: Michael A. Owsley
Represented By: W. Cravens Priest, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?