Mackey v. Miller Pipeline, LLC
Plaintiff: Chris Mackey
Defendant: Miller Pipeline, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00444
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/31/2021: The #10 motion to remand is GRANTED. This case is REMANDED to Jefferson Circuit Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (DLW)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/18/2021. Per filing of #10 Stipulation and #11 Stipulation, the telephonic scheduling conference scheduled for 8/26/2021 is remanded from the docket. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (TLB)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION by Miller Pipeline, LLC. (Burnham, Ralph)
August 6, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for remand by Miller Pipeline, LLC. (Burnham, Ralph)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE re Supplemental Notice Clarifying the Status of its Members and Their Citizenships by Miller Pipeline, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #8 ORDER (Burnham, Ralph) Modified on 7/23/2021 to link to order (DLW).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/13/2021: Within ten (10) days of entry of this Order, Miller Pipeline shall file supplemental notice clarifying the status of its members and their citizenships. cc: Counsel (DLW)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/13/2021: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2021 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (DLW)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/12/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Miller Pipeline, LLC. (Burnham, Ralph)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph E. Burnham on behalf of Miller Pipeline, LLC (Burnham, Ralph)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Miller Pipeline, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-003381 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3377009). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer Filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet) (MNM)
July 7, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action by Miller Pipeline, LLC. (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackey v. Miller Pipeline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Mackey
Represented By: Darren C. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: James Kelly Ratliff
Represented By: Ralph E. Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?