Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Sheila Johnson, Derek Hahn and Elizabeth Johnson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00475
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Sheila Johnson waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Roberts, Kevin)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Elizabeth Johnson waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Roberts, Kevin)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Derek Hahn waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Roberts, Kevin)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (SRH)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (SRH)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 Appearance of Counsel, by Kevin E. Roberts, on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (SRH)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER, filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, against Derek Hahn, Elizabeth Johnson, and Sheila Johnson. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3386338. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Plan Document, #2 Exhibit B- 2/21/20 Beneficiary Designation, #3 Exhibit C- Power of Attorney, #4 Exhibit D- 10/26/88 Beneficiary Designation, #5 Exhibit E- Death Certificate, #6 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?