Atkinson v. Ouellet Baxley et al
Plaintiff: Terry L. Atkinson
Defendant: Danell M. Ouellet Baxley and Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00483
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 Agreed REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Danell M. Ouellet Baxley, Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Zipperle, Gene)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/4/2021: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2887606. cc: Counsel (DLW)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/4/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Danell M. Ouellet Baxley, Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Zipperle, Gene)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (MNM)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Werner Enterprises, Inc. and Danell M. Ouellet Baxley from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-003650 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3389272). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkinson v. Ouellet Baxley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L. Atkinson
Represented By: Lawrence Irwin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danell M. Ouellet Baxley
Represented By: Gene F. Zipperle, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan J. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Gene F. Zipperle, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan J. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?