J.P. Morgan Securities LLC v. Kittell
Plaintiff: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Defendant: Matthew S. Kittell
Case Number: 3:2021cv00512
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Text Order by Judge Beaton: The Court held a telephonic hearing on 8/30/21 concerning the TRO entered in this case on 8/16/21. In light of the parties agreed order (DN #15 ) and their concurrence during the hearing, the Court acknowledges that the TRO will lapse at the conclusion of its original 14-day duration and stays this case. The Court asks the parties to file a joint status report or a stipulation of dismissal no later than 11/30/21. (Court Reporter: Becky Boyd. TIC: 5min) cc: counsel (JM)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order Staying Action by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Meek, Dustin)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by Judge Beaton. The Court REJECTS the proposed stipulated preliminary injunction (DN #12 ) and proposed stipulated temporary restraining order (DN #13 ), and GRANTS the Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (DN #3 ).. cc: Counsel(JM)
August 13, 2021 Proceedings held before Judge Beaton: Telephone Conference held on 8/13/2021. (Court Reporter: Becky Boyd. TIC: 26 min) (JM)
August 13, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order Stipulated Temporary Restraining Order by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Meek, Dustin) Modified text on 8/13/2021 (JM).
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Agreed Order Stipulated Preliminary Injunction by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Meek, Dustin)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Norris on behalf of Matthew S. Kittell (Norris, Kevin)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/12/2021 granting #7 Motion for Attorney Leonard Weintraub to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Edwards may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Judge Beaton would like to schedule a telephonic status conference to discuss J.P. Morgan's motion for a temporary restraining order (DN #3 ) for 8/13/2021 at 11:00 a.m. Eastern. The parties and counsel may connect by dialing 888-363-4734 and entering access code 4268238. Should either party need to reschedule due to a conflict, please contact the opposing party and propose at least two mutually convenient alternative windows by contacting chambers at judge_Beaton_Chambers@kywd.uscourts.gov. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, Defendant (via U.S. mail) (JM)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leonard Weintraub to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3399098. by Plaintiff J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Meek, Dustin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILINGS TO DEFENDANT by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Meek, Dustin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Matthew S. Kittell. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, and MOTION to Expedited Discovery filed by Plaintiff J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Declaration of Sherry D. Carrico, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Declaration of Leonard Weintraub, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Proposed Order) (MNM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (MNM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew S. Kittell; filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3398397, filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC v. Kittell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Dustin E. Meek
Represented By: Leonard Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S. Kittell
Represented By: Kevin M. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?