Emergent Capital Group, LLC v. Hensley
Plaintiff: Emergent Capital Group, LLC
Defendant: Dustin Lee Hensley
Case Number: 3:2021cv00548
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF NEIL MARTIN MCINTIRE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/11/2022 granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel; Neil Martin McIntire(JWM)
October 7, 2022 Filing 23 Supplement to #21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Emergent Capital Group, LLC (Nolan, Daniel) Modified on 10/10/2022: changed from Motion to Supplement to Motion and created link to #21 (RLK).
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ORDERING ATTORNEY NEIL MARTIN MCINTIRE TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/16/22 re #21 MOTION for Neil Martin McIntire to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3659511. filed by Emergent Capital Group, LLC : McIntire shall file a Notice advising the Court of the method of training completed on the use of the Court's electronic filing system. Upon compliance with this Order the matter will stand submitted to the Court. cc: Counsel (DJT)
September 15, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Neil Martin McIntire to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3659511. by Plaintiff Emergent Capital Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standings) (Nolan, Daniel)
August 30, 2022 Filing 20 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Neil Martin McIntire re #18 Telephone Conference, #19 Status Conference.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/16/2022. (KJA)
August 17, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FROM TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE for proceedings held before Judge Claria Horn Boom. Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/16/2022. This matter is STAYED pending resolution of the circuit court matter. The matter shall remain stayed until either party advises the Court when the case is to be returned to the active docket. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss DN #11 will not be taken up by the Court until the matter is returned to the active docket. (Court Reporter: Becky Boyd) cc: counsel, Neil McIntire via email (SRH)
August 15, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FROM TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE from proceedings held before Judge Claria Horn Boom; Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/15/2022: This matter is SET for a further Telephonic Status Conference on Tuesday, 8/16/2022, at the hour of 4:00 p.m. ET, before the Honorable Claria Horn Boom, United States District Judge. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Conference by dialing the toll-free number 866-363-4735 and entering access code 9522526#. Parties shall dial into the Conference five (5) minutes prior to the Conference. (Court Reporter April Dowell.) cc: Counsel, Neil McIntire(via email at nmcintire@howell-fisher.com) (DJT)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/9/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/15/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claria Horn Boom. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 888-363-4735 and entering access code 9522526#. Parties shall dial into the Conference five (5) minutes prior to the Conference. cc: counsel (JM)
March 22, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emergent Capital Group, LLC. (Nolan, Daniel)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING CORPORATE PARTY TO FILE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/14/22: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Emergent Capital Group, LLC, shall FILE a Corporate Disclosure Statement that complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 NO LATER THAN SEVEN (7) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. cc:counsel (DJT)
October 18, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dustin Lee Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law) (Merrifield, William)
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Emergent Capital Group, LLC. (Nolan, Daniel)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergent Capital Group, LLC. Dustin Lee Hensley served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Nolan, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Dustin Lee Hensley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (con't), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12) (Merrifield, William)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/14/21: The Courts Show Cause Order [R. #4 ] is hereby DISCHARGED.cc: Counsel (DJT)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Emergent Capital Group, LLC. (Nolan, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to Dustin Lee Hensley. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing by Emergent Capital Group, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons Alias Summons) (Nolan, Daniel)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to Dustin Lee Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Summons Green Card) (Nolan, Daniel)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/31/2021: Within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. cc: Counsel (DLW)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/31/2021. Within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, Defendant shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. cc:counsel (KJA)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dustin Lee Hensley. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dustin Lee Hensley Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3412148, filed by Emergent Capital Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Blank filed in the Master Case, #3 Exhibit A- Text Message, #4 Exhibit B - Notice) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emergent Capital Group, LLC v. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergent Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Mark Nolan
Represented By: Neil Martin McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Lee Hensley
Represented By: William A. Merrifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?