Clayton v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Donald Clayton
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00551
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Target Corporation. (Boroughs, Terri)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 10/8/2021. Counsel having failed to submit a joint litigation plan, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/12/2021 is RESCHEDULED to 11/4/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The dial in information shall remain the same. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (AEH)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 9/7/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 case management conference set for 10/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2887606. cc: counsel (JM)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Edwards may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. (MNM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Target Corporation. (MNM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-04251 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3414660). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Filing in State Court, #4 Cover Sheet Blank) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Clayton
Represented By: Martin N. Kute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Megan L. J. Adkins
Represented By: Richard Paul Schiller
Represented By: Terri E. Boroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?