AT&T Corp. v. Bizzack Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Defendant: Bizzack Construction, LLC and Louisville Paving Company, Inc. doing business as Louisville Paving and Construction
Case Number: 3:2021cv00564
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Claria Horn Boom
2 Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff AT&T Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Summons Bizzack summons, #4 Summons Louisville Paving summons) (Hornback, Katherine)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Edwards may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/15/2021; IT IS ORDERED that Judge David J. Hale RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to the docket of Judge Benjamin Beaton, for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials BJB on all future pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel, CM-Beaton (NWT)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/14/20: Judge Claria Horn Boom recused. Case reassigned to Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedingscc: Counsel, CM-DJH (DJT)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/10/21: Within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. cc: Counsel (DJT)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bizzack Construction, LLC, Louisville Paving Company, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Louisville Paving Company, Inc.) (DJT)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT(s) Summons for Louisville Paving re #1 Complaint by AT&T Corp.. (Hornback, Katherine)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT(s) Summons for Bizzack Construction re #1 Complaint by AT&T Corp.. (Hornback, Katherine)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent AT&T, Inc. for AT&T Corp.. by AT&T Corp.. (DJT)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bizzack Construction, LLC, Louisville Paving Company, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3420880., filed by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Corp. v. Bizzack Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Katherine J. Hornback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bizzack Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Paving Company, Inc. doing business as Louisville Paving and Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?