Merch Traffic, LLC v. Various John Does et al
Plaintiff: Merch Traffic, LLC
Defendant: Various John Does, Various Jane Does and ABC Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00576
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF HEARING AND ORDER: Judge Beaton held an in-person hearing on 10/5/21, as required by 15 U.S.C. 1116(d)(10)(A), regarding the status of the temporary restraining order and order of seizure entered in this case on 9/23/21 (DN #12 ). Based on the information and evidence offered by counsel for Merch Traffic at the hearing, the Court dissolves the temporary restraining order and order of seizure. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(3); 28 U.S.C. 1116(10)(A). An opinion explaining the Courts order will follow at a later date. (Court Reporter: Becky Boyd) (time in court: 0/28) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/4/2021 granting #14 Motion for Attorney Cara R. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
October 1, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration) of Thomas Donnell Regarding Service of Order by Merch Traffic, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proofs of Service/Receipts) by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Burns, Cara)
September 29, 2021 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Cara Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3441036. by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Standing) (Burns, Cara)
September 24, 2021 Remark: Bond for $5,000.00 receipt# L33067991 (Ferguson, Kim)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court grants Merch Traffic, LLC's motion for a temporary restraining order and order of seizure (DN #5 ). The temporary restraining order shall remain in effect for 14 days unless a further order of the Court dissolves or extends it. The Court sets an in-person hearing on the preliminary injunction on 10/5/21 at 1:30 p.m. Eastern in the Louisville courthouse. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 9/22/2021 denying #9 Motion for Attorney Cara R. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Lindsay may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF HEARING: Judge Beaton held a telephonic hearing on 09/21/2021 regarding Merch Traffic's motion for temporary restraining order (DN #5 ). (Court Reporter Becky Boyd)(Time: 38 minutes) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Cara R. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3432278. by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Bar of California) (Barszcz, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2021: #2 Proposed Order) (JM).
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Judge Beaton would like to schedule a telephonic status conference for 9/21/2021 at 3:00 p.m. Eastern. Counsel may connect by dialing 888-363-4734 and entering access code 4268238. Should counsel need to reschedule due to a conflict, please confer with opposing counsel, agree on at least two mutually convenient alternative windows, and propose them to the Court by contacting chambers at judge_Beaton_Chambers@kywd.uscourts.gov, copying all counsel. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (JM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Receipt of Non-Electronic Document re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ABC Company, Various Jane Does, Various John Does. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Rule 65 Certificate of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Counsel Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Counsel Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Counsel Exhibit C, #6 Declaration of Thomas Donnell, #7 Exhibit A - to Declaration, #8 Exhibit B - to Declaration, #9 Exhibit C - to Declaration, #10 Proposed Order) (MNM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing re: Trademark re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merch Traffic, LLC. (MNM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Company, Various Jane Does, and Various John Does. Filing fee $402, receipt number L33067932, filed by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merch Traffic, LLC v. Various John Does et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merch Traffic, LLC
Represented By: Cara R. Burns
Represented By: Matthew Barszcz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?