Freeman v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Darren Freeman
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00605
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne-Tyler Morgan on behalf of Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company (Morgan, Anne-Tyler)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/2/21: Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2022 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Telephonic Status Conference by dialing the toll-free number 888-808-6929 and entering access code 2887606#. Parties shall dial into the conference five (5) minutes prior to the Conference. cc:counsel (DJT)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/1/2021. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except for pretrial conference and trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company. (Amato, Stephen)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING AGREED ORDER signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/12/21; granting #6 Proposed Agreed Order: Defendant Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company SHALL have up to and including 10/29/2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. cc: Counsel(DJT)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company. (Amato, Stephen)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Trevor L. Earl as Counsel for Defendant by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company (Earl, Trevor)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company. (DJT)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-05285. Filing fee $ 402; receipt number AKYWDC-3438051, filed by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - state court complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in Jefferson Circuit Court) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Freeman
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen G. Amato
Represented By: Trevor L. Earl
Represented By: Anne-Tyler Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?