Caldwell v. The Kroger Co.
Plaintiff: Thomas Caldwell
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00611
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/2/2021: Within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, Kroger shall file a response to the motion to remand showing cause why the case should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. cc: Counsel (DLW)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Thomas Caldwell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Scharfenberger, Kurt)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 10/21/2021: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2887606. cc: Counsel (DLW)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/18/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by The Kroger Co. (Ellis, Rudy)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Marion Circuit Court (MNM)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 ATTACHMENTS - State Court File re #1 Notice of Removal by The Kroger Co. (MNM)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kroger Co. (MNM)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co. from Marion Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-000176 (filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3443633). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Caldwell
Represented By: Kurt A. Scharfenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Faith C. Whittaker
Represented By: Rudy J. Ellis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?