Campbell v. Microsurfacing Contractors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christian Campbell
Defendant: Microsurfacing Contractors LLC and Unknown Defendants
Case Number: 3:2021cv00630
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Microsurfacing Contractors LLC. (Dunn, John)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 11/9/2021: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (DLW)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/9/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Microsurfacing Contractors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Byrne Certificate of Incorporation) (Dunn, John)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/14/2021: Within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, Microsurfacing Contractors shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). cc: Counsel (DLW)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microsurfacing Contractors LLC. (MNM)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Hardin Circuit Court (MNM)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Microsurfacing Contractors LLC from Hardin Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-01227 (filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3449315). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer Filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (MNM)
October 13, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint previously filed in state court action by Microsurfacing Contractors LLC. (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Microsurfacing Contractors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Campbell
Represented By: William E Cowley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsurfacing Contractors LLC
Represented By: John M. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?