Marrero-Perez v. Yanfeng US Automotive Interior Systems II LLC
Plaintiff: Victor Marrero-Perez
Defendant: Yanfeng US Automotive Interior Systems II LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00645
Filed: October 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/20/2021 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have 20 days from the signing of this order to file a Response to the Motion to Dismiss (DN #5 ). cc: Counsel (JM)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N. Wimsatt on behalf of Yanfeng US Automotive Interior Systems II LLC (Wimsatt, Jessica)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Victor Marrero-Perez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hayward, Samuel)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 11/23/2021 granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading, as well as the corporate disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, on or before 11/15/2021. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Yanfeng US Automotive Interior Systems II LLC re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Inman, J.)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Yanfeng US Automotive Interior Systems II LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective Bargaining Agreement) (Inman, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2021: #2 Proposed Order) (SMJ).
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Yanfeng US Automotive Interior Systems II LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting extension) (Inman, J.)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (SRH)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
October 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Yanfeng US Automotive Interior Systems II LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-005339. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3457156). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court record, #2 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marrero-Perez v. Yanfeng US Automotive Interior Systems II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Marrero-Perez
Represented By: Samuel G. Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanfeng US Automotive Interior Systems II LLC
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Represented By: Jessica N. Wimsatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?