Burgess v. Mullins et al
Plaintiff: Damon G. Burgess
Defendant: Dwayne H. Mullins, Rumen Y. Katrev, Thomas Mulligan, CTC Transportation Insurance Services, LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Missouri LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Hawaii LLC, Criterion Claim Solutions of Omaha, Inc., Lexicon Insurance Management LLC, Chelsea Financial Group, Inc., 10-4 Preferred Risk Managers Inc. and County Hall Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00664
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand filed by CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Hawaii LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Missouri LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services, LLC, Thomas Mulligan. (Kleinert, Michael)
December 30, 2021 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand filed by County Hall Insurance Company, Inc.. (Lennon, Nathan)
December 30, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lexicon Insurance Management LLC. (Falkner, Rheanne)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/21/2021 granting #27 Agreed Order for Extension of Time. Defendant County Hall Insurance Company SHALL have up to and including 12/31/2021, within which to file its respective responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's #22 Motion for Remand. cc: Counsel (DLW)
December 17, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by 10-4 Preferred Risk Managers Inc., Criterion Claim Solutions of Omaha, Inc. (Pullen, Andrew)
December 16, 2021 Filing 32 Proposed Agreed Order for extension by CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Hawaii LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Missouri LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services, LLC, Thomas Mulligan. (Kleinert, Michael)
December 16, 2021 Filing 31 Proposed Agreed Order for extension by CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Hawaii LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Missouri LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services, LLC, Thomas Mulligan. (Kleinert, Michael)
December 16, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Damon G. Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Gillett v. Spirit, #3 Exhibit State of Nevada v. Spirit - First Status Report, #4 Exhibit State of Nevada v. Spirit - Fourth Status Report, #5 Exhibit FTI Consulting Report, #6 Exhibit Richardson v. Mulligan, et al. - Complaint) (Naiser, A.)
December 15, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand filed by Lexicon Insurance Management LLC. (Falkner, Rheanne)
December 15, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand filed by Chelsea Financial Group, Inc. (Davis, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 27 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Remand by Defendant County Hall Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lennon, Nathan)
December 15, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #25 MOTION to Dismiss , #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Damon G. Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gillett v. Spirit, #2 Exhibit Special Report, #3 Exhibit State of Nevada v. Spirit - Second Status Report, #4 Exhibit State of Nevada v. Spirit - Fourth Status Report, #5 Exhibit CTC Website, #6 Exhibit FTI Consulting Excerpt, #7 Exhibit Injunction and Order Appointing Commissioner as Permanent Receiver of Spirit, #8 Exhibit State of Nevada v. Spirit - Eleventh Status Report, #9 Exhibit Mulligan Property Records, #10 Exhibit Affidavit of Michael Reilly, #11 Exhibit Travis & Herber Timesheet, #12 Exhibit Affidavit of Damon Burgess, #13 Exhibit CTC Auto Liability Insurance Screenshot, #14 Exhibit CTC Transportation Ins. Article, #15 Exhibit CTC Transportation Screenshot, #16 Exhibit Insurance Business Facebook Screenshot, #17 Exhibit Receivership Article, #18 Proposed Order) (Naiser, A.)
December 8, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Chelsea Financial Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Michael)
December 3, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Rheanne D. Falkner on behalf of Lexicon Insurance Management LLC (Falkner, Rheanne)
December 3, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Lexicon Insurance Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Daniel George) (Falkner, Rheanne)
December 1, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Damon G. Burgess (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Reilly, Michael)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/1/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED ORDER by County Hall Insurance Company, Inc. re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lennon, Nathan)
November 30, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant County Hall Insurance Company, Inc. (Lennon, Nathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (DLW).
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Hawaii LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Missouri LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services, LLC, Thomas Mulligan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - State Court docket, #3 Exhibit B - Spirit Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit C - Nevada Court's 7/16/2020 Order, #5 Exhibit D - Spirit Receiver's First Status Report dated 5/31/2019, #6 Exhibit E - Wesco Reinsurance Agreement, #7 Exhibit F - Accredited Reinsurance Agreement) (Kleinert, Michael)
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10-4 Preferred Risk Managers Inc. (Pullen, Andrew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by 10-4 Preferred Risk Managers Inc. (Pullen, Andrew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Criterion Claim Solutions of Omaha, Inc. (Pullen, Andrew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Criterion Claim Solutions of Omaha, Inc. (Pullen, Andrew)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Hawaii LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Missouri LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services, LLC, Thomas Mulligan. (Kleinert, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Missouri LLC. (Kleinert, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Hawaii LLC. (Kleinert, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CTC Transportation Insurance Services, LLC. (Kleinert, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Kleinert on behalf of CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Hawaii LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Missouri LLC, CTC Transportation Insurance Services, LLC, Thomas Mulligan (Kleinert, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge David J. Hale on 11/5/2021 re #1 Notice of Removal. Within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chelsea Financial Group, Inc. (Davis, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Davis on behalf of Chelsea Financial Group, Inc. (Davis, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Bullitt Circuit Court (MNM)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by County Hall Insurance Company, Inc. (MNM)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Lennon on behalf of County Hall Insurance Company, Inc. (MNM)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by County Hall Insurance Company, Inc. from Bullitt Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00319 (filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3463013). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service of Process, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)
November 2, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action by Rumen Y. Katrev and Dwayne H. Mullins. (MNM)
November 2, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action by Chelsea Financial Group, Inc. (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Mullins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon G. Burgess
Represented By: A. Nicholas Naiser
Represented By: Michael P. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne H. Mullins
Represented By: Katherine J. Hornback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rumen Y. Katrev
Represented By: Katherine J. Hornback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mulligan
Represented By: Michael E. Kleinert
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Represented By: Ameena Raheel Khan
Represented By: Matthew W. Breetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTC Transportation Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Kleinert
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Represented By: Ameena Raheel Khan
Represented By: Matthew W. Breetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Missouri LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Kleinert
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Represented By: Ameena Raheel Khan
Represented By: Matthew W. Breetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTC Transportation Insurance Services of Hawaii LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Kleinert
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Represented By: Ameena Raheel Khan
Represented By: Matthew W. Breetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criterion Claim Solutions of Omaha, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Pullen
Represented By: Rebecca A. Lambert
Represented By: Nicholas John Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexicon Insurance Management LLC
Represented By: Angelo D. DiBartolomeo
Represented By: Denise M. Motta
Represented By: Rheanne D. Falkner
Represented By: Spencer Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10-4 Preferred Risk Managers Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Pullen
Represented By: Rebecca A. Lambert
Represented By: Nicholas John Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Hall Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan A. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?