Yost v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Gary Yost
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America, LLC and Philips RS North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00746
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-10 from WD/PA re MDL 3014 (KJA)
January 4, 2022 Case transferred to District of WD/PA. Case electronically transferred. (KJA)
January 4, 2022 Remark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in Western District of Pennsylvania as case 2:22-cv-00014, filed 01/04/2022. (KJA)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/22/2021 granting #2 Motion to Recognize Notice of Removal as Timely Filed or in the Alternative for Extension of Time. The Notice of Removal filed on December 16, 2021 (DN #1 ) is DEEMED timelyfiled. cc: Counsel (JM)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/21/2021 granting #6 Motion to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL No. 3014. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED. cc: Counsel (JM)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion of Non-Opposition #2 by Gary Yost (Blandford, Stephen) Modified on 12/21/2021 to edit docket text (KJA).
December 21, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Recognize Notice of Removal as Timely Filed OR In the Alternative for Extension of Time re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Gary Yost. (SEE DN #7 FOR FULL VIEWING) (KJA)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL No. 3014 by Defendants Philips North America, LLC, and Philips RS North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice to Tag Along Action, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Stay Orders, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Stay) (Pellino, Andrew) Modified on 12/21/2021: removed Koninklijke Philips N.V. as a party filer from docket text and as a party filer (RLK).
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V. for Philips RS North America, LLC. by Philips RS North America, LLC. (Pellino, Andrew)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Oldham Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Recognize Notice of Removal as Timely Filed OR In the Alternative for Extension of Time re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendants Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America, LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DJT)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ NO ANSWER FILED] by Philips RS North America, LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America, LLC from Oldham Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00525. Filing fee $ 402 ; receipt number AKYWDC-3490786, filed by Philips RS North America, LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Services of Process, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Process, #6 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Rhonda McCormick, #7 Exhibit E - Yost Payment, #8 Exhibit F - Declaration of James Durchak, #9 Exhibit G - Philips RS North America LLC Corporate Records, #10 Exhibit H - Philips RS North America Holding Corporation Corporate Records, #11 Exhibit I -Philips North America LLC Corporate Records, #12 Exhibit J - Philips Holding USA Inc. Corporate Records, #13 Exhibit K - Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit L - State Notice of Notice of Removal) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yost v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Yost
Represented By: Stephen C. Blandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Represented By: Andrew D. Pellino
Represented By: David V. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Pellino
Represented By: David V. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips RS North America, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Pellino
Represented By: David V. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?