United States of America v. Snider
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cheri Snider and Cheri R. Baker
Case Number: 3:2022cv00066
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 U.S. Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Cheri Snider served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Campbell, William)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cheri Snider. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cheri Snider, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Reamortization Agreement, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri R. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?