Hughley v. University of Louisville-Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Edward Hughley
Defendant: University of Louisville-Medical Center and Zantac-Manfunctures
Case Number: 3:2022cv00268
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to GO 2022-08 Case reassigned to Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. Judge Beaton no longer assigned to case. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (EBOC) signed by Judge Benjamin Beaton on 6/13/2022 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (MNM)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. cc: Plaintiff (pro-se) (DeW)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (DeW)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maurice Edward Hughley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (DeW)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of Louisville-Medical Center, Zantac-Manfunctures, filed by Maurice Edward Hughley. (DeW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughley v. University of Louisville-Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Edward Hughley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Louisville-Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zantac-Manfunctures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?