Corbett et al v. Cargill Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Corbett, Jr. and Christopher G. Hunt
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated and Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2022cv00281
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DOCKET CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS TENDERED TO THE COURT ON 5/26/2022 by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/27/2022. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file the Corporate Disclosure Statements that were tendered to the Court on 5/26/2022 with that same filing date. The Order docketed on 6/16/2022 (DN #8 ) is WITHDRAWN. cc: counsel (SRH)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Withdrawn per #11 -- ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/16/2022. Defendants Cargill Incorporated and Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated shall each file a Corporate Disclosure Statement that complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 NO LATER THAN (7) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. cc: counsel (SRH) Modified on 6/29/2022: withdrawn (RLK).
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Cargill Incorporated, Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated. (Gray, Elisabeth)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/8/2022, GRANTING Motions for Emily McAdam #4 and Mark L. Johnson #5 to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cargill Incorporated and Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
June 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Mark L. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3597130. by Defendants Cargill Incorporated, Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gray, Elisabeth)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Emily McAdam to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3597083. by Defendants Cargill Incorporated, Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gray, Elisabeth)
May 26, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated. (SRH)
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cargill Incorporated. (SRH)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE To Marion Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties re: DN #1 Notice of Removal. (CDL)
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (CDL)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated and Cargill Incorporated (No Answer Filed) from Marion Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-00072. ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt no. AKYWDC-3590206), filed by Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated and Cargill Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Circuit Court Notice) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbett et al v. Cargill Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Corbett, Jr.
Represented By: John C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher G. Hunt
Represented By: John C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Matthew P. Dearmond
Represented By: Emily Muirhead McAdam
Represented By: Mark L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern States Cooperative, Incorporated
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Matthew P. Dearmond
Represented By: Emily Muirhead McAdam
Represented By: Mark L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?