Naszady v. E Z Portable Building, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Naszady
Defendant: E Z Portable Building, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00287
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Order Extending the Responsive Pleading Deadline (DN #15 ) through August 24, 2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (JM)
July 25, 2022 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline and Dismissing Class Action Claims by E Z Portable Building, Inc.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
July 11, 2022 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the parties' request to enter the proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendants Time to Respond (DN #13 ) through July 25, 2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(JM)
July 6, 2022 Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant's Responsive Pleading Deadline through July 25, 2022 by E Z Portable Building, Inc.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/30/2022 granting #10 Motion for Attorney Daniel M. Solar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Lindsay may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
June 27, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Daniel Solar to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3607954. by Plaintiff Joseph Naszady (Flick, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2022: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (DeW).
June 24, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Order to Extend Defendant's Pleading Deadline (DN #7 ) up to and including July 11, 2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (JM)
June 23, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E Z Portable Building, Inc.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
June 23, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline by E Z Portable Building, Inc.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Naszady. E Z Portable Building, Inc. served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Flick, Brian)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Marc E. Dann re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/27/2022. (KJA)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Daniel M. Solar re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/27/2022. (KJA)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to E Z Portable Building, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDL)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (CDL)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against E Z Portable Building, Inc., filed by Joseph Naszady (Filing fee $ 402; Receipt number AKYWDC-3591748). (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Contract, #3 Exhibit 2 - Receipt from Maxsteel Buildings 1, #4 Exhibit 3 - Receipt from Maxsteel Buildings 2, #5 Summons Tendered) (CDL) Modified on 6/1/2022 to correct docket text(CDL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naszady v. E Z Portable Building, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Naszady
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Daniel M. Solar
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Z Portable Building, Inc.
Represented By: Chadwick A. McTighe
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?