Davis v. Lear Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mittie Lavone Davis
Defendant: Lear Corporation and Broadspire Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00429
Filed: August 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2611 FMLA: Definitions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Crawford & Company for Broadspire Services, Inc.. by Broadspire Services, Inc.. (Gevertz, David)
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Broadspire's Motion to Dismiss Count Five of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant Broadspire Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Gevertz, David)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/22/2022 granting #7 Motion for David E. Gevertz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
September 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for David E. Gevertz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3662498. by Defendant Broadspire Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gevertz Good Standing Cert,, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ballinger-Holden, Jamie)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/15/2022 granting #4 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Broadspire Services, Inc. shall have to and including 9/28/2022, to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
September 14, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lear Corporation. (O'Donnell, Kimberly)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order (Consent Order) by Broadspire Services, Inc.. (Ballinger-Holden, Jamie)
August 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Broadspire Services, Inc. and Lear Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDL)
August 18, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (CDL)
August 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Broadspire Services, Inc. and Lear Corporation, (Filing fee $402; Receipt No. AKYWDC-3640828), filed by Mittie Lavone Davis. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Lear Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mittie Lavone Davis
Represented By: Ayala Golding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly J. O'Donnell
Represented By: Sarah T. Laren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadspire Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Edward Gevertz
Represented By: Jamie M. Ballinger-Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?