Bradley v. BSL Express Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emilee Bradley
Defendant: BSL Express Trucking, Inc. and Fatkhuddin Kurbonov
Case Number: 3:2023cv00133
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BSL Express Trucking, Inc., Fatkhuddin Kurbonov. (Norris, Christina)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by BSL Express Trucking, Inc., Fatkhuddin Kurbonov. (Norris, Christina)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 4/27/2023: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2887606. cc: Counsel (DLW)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/21/2023; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by BSL Express Trucking, Inc., Fatkhuddin Kurbonov. (Norris, Christina)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by BSL Express Trucking, Inc., Fatkhuddin Kurbonov. (Norris, Christina)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BSL Express Trucking, Inc., Fatkhuddin Kurbonov. Amendment to #6 Order, #1 Notice of Removal by BSL Express Trucking, Inc., Fatkhuddin Kurbonov. (Norris, Christina) Modified on 3/23/2023 to link to #1 Notice of Removal (DLW).
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/21/2023: Within ten (10) days of entry of this Order the defendants SHALL FILE a corrected notice of removal that appropriately identifies the Court in both the heading and substance of the filing. cc: Counsel (DLW)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal to Christina R. L. Norris, attorney for the defendants. Reason for Deficiency: Missing 7.1 (a)(2) Disclosure Statement for BSL Express Trucking, Inc. and Fatkhuddin Kurbonov. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/27/2023. (CDL)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDL)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (CDL)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by BSL Express Trucking, Inc. (CDL)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (No Answer Filed) by Fatkhuddin Kurbonov, BSL Express Trucking, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-000923, (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3773698), filed by Fatkhuddin Kurbonov, BSL Express Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons - Kurbonov, #4 Exhibit Summons - BSL, #5 Exhibit Discovery Requests - Kurbonov, #6 Exhibit Discovery Requests - BSL, #7 Cover Sheet) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. BSL Express Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilee Bradley
Represented By: Jonathan B. Hollan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSL Express Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Christina R. L. Norris
Represented By: Mary Katherine Brashear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fatkhuddin Kurbonov
Represented By: Christina R. L. Norris
Represented By: Mary Katherine Brashear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?