Green et al v. J.M. Smucker, LLC
Plaintiff: Veronica Green
Defendant: J.M. Smucker, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Case Number: 3:2023cv00289
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/29/2023. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 8/30/2023. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 10/25/2023. All Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2024. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 5/30/2024. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 6/30/2024. All Expert Discovery due by 7/30/2024. Joint Status Report due by 3/19/2024. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/26/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing toll free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744#. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 9/30/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2025 at 2:30 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings (*see order for pretrial filing requirements). Jury Trial set for 4/21/2025 at 9:30 AM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. cc: Counsel, Jury Admin. (SMJ)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/29/2023. The 8/30/2023 telephonic scheduling conference is REMANDED from the docket. The Court will issue a scheduling plan by separate order. Any party that would like to discuss the scheduling plan may contact case manager Theresa Burch at theresa_burch@kywd.uscourts.gov to schedule a telephonic conference. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (TLB)
August 21, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by J.M. Smucker, LLC. (Vance, Palmer)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/21/2023 granting #9 Motion for Richard Fama to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/19/2023. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 8/30/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
July 19, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Richard Fama to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3847129. by Defendant J.M. Smucker, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vance, Palmer)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/6/2023 -- pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a magistrate judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (https://www.kywd.uscourts.gov/sites/kywd/files/forms/ao085-1-Notice-Consent.pdf) and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel, CHL-CM (SMJ)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by J.M. Smucker, LLC. (Vance, Palmer)
June 14, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Dalia Maaitah re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/5/2023. (KJA)
June 6, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDL)
June 5, 2023 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (CDL)
June 5, 2023 Filing 3 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by J.M. Smucker, LLC. (CDL)
June 5, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Smucker Foods, Inc., Corporate Parent The J.M. Smucker Company for J.M. Smucker, LLC. (CDL)
June 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (No Answer Filed) by J.M. Smucker, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-002572, (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3821071), filed by J.M. Smucker, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice, #3 Cover Sheet) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. J.M. Smucker, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Green
Represented By: Lauren E. Marley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: Dalia Maaitah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Smucker, LLC
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Represented By: Richard Fama
Represented By: Jamila Malaika Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?