Smith v. Greenberg et al
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Smith
Defendant: Louisville Metro Government, Paul Humphrey, Russell Coleman and Mayor Craig Greenberg
Case Number: 3:2024cv00653
Filed: November 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony L. Smith. (DeW)
November 23, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Anthony L. Smith. (KDY)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 11/19/2024. The applications DN #2 & #6 are DENIED without prejudice to refiling. Within 30 days of entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either 1) file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees on the Courts form in which he completes every portion of the application form and explains how he has no monthly expenses; or 2) pay the $405 filing fee for this action. Plaintiff is reminded that the application is signed under penalty of perjury. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a non-prisoner application form with this case number. Plaintiff is WARNED that failure to comply with this Order within the time allotted will result in dismissal of this action. cc: Plaintiff (pro-se) w/ IFP form (DeW)
November 16, 2024 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Anthony L. Smith against Russell Coleman, Craig Greenberg, Paul Humphrey, Louisville Metro Government. (KDY)
November 15, 2024 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Anthony L. Smith against Russell Coleman, Craig Greenberg, Paul Humphrey, Louisville Metro Government. (KDY)
November 14, 2024 Filing 6 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Anthony L. Smith. (KDY)
November 14, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES WITH JURY DEMAND (AMENDED) against Craig Greenberg, Russell Coleman, Paul Humphrey and Louisville Metro Government filed by Anthony L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons Coleman - Tendered, #2 Summons Greenberg - Tendered, #3 Summons Humphrey - Tendered) (KDY)
November 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint (MNM)
November 12, 2024 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (MNM)
November 8, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony L. Smith (MNM)
November 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Russell Coleman, Craig Greenberg, Paul Humphrey, and Louisville Metro Government, filed by Anthony L. Smith. (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Greenberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Metro Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Craig Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?