Summers v. Louisville Metro Government
Plaintiff: Dell Flippins Summers
Defendant: Louisville Metro Government
Case Number: 3:2025cv00104
Filed: February 22, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 bv Bivens Non-Prisoner
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Louisville Metro Government (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Guilty Plea, #3 Proposed Order) (Miller, Andrew)
March 31, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dell Flippins Summers. Louisville Metro Government served on 3/21/2025, answer due 4/11/2025. (DLW)
March 18, 2025 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Louisville Metro Government. Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DLW)
March 6, 2025 Filing fee: $ 405.00 receipt number 300011343 re #3 Notice of Deficiency by Dell Flippins Summers. (SLK)
February 25, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Filing Fee not paid nor IFP Motion Filed. No Summons Tendered. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/27/2025. (DJT)
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
February 22, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louisville Metro Government, filed by Dell Flippins Summers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summers v. Louisville Metro Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dell Flippins Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Metro Government
Represented By: Joseph Roberts Abney
Represented By: Andrew S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?