Papineau et al v. Brake Supply Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Holly Papineau and Jack Papineau
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex, LLC, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc. and Brake Supply Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00168
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Second Alias Summons Issued as to Pneumo-Abex, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE Summons (Second Alias) - Abex by Holly Papineau, Jack Papineau re #1 Complaint, (Kelley, Paul)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Non-Service of Summons by Holly Papineau, Jack Papineau re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Kelley, Paul)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Non-Service of Summons by Holly Papineau, Jack Papineau re #3 Summons Issued, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Kelley, Paul)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Alias Summons Issued as to Pneumo-Abex, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/30/2018) (DJT).
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE Alias Summons by Holly Papineau, Jack Papineau re #1 Complaint, (Kelley, Paul)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Genuine Parts Company. (Gault, Patrick)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Davidson, Scott)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Genuine Parts Company. (Gault, Patrick)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Davidson, Scott)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Koch Enterprises, Inc. for Brake Supply Company, Inc.. (JM)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Brake Supply Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Def. Brake Supply Company) (Vance, Palmer)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/23/18: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brake Supply Company, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Pneumo-Abex, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Honeywell, #2 Summons as to Pneumo-Abex, #3 Summons as to Genuine Parts) (DJT)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brake Supply Company, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Pneumo-Abex, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2738799., filed by Jack Papineau, Holly Papineau. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papineau et al v. Brake Supply Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Papineau
Represented By: Paul J. Ivie
Represented By: James E. Kiser
Represented By: Gary E. Schaaf
Represented By: Paul J. Kelley
Represented By: Joseph D. Satterley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Papineau
Represented By: Paul J. Ivie
Represented By: James E. Kiser
Represented By: Gary E. Schaaf
Represented By: Paul J. Kelley
Represented By: Joseph D. Satterley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Patrick W. Gault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Allen Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brake Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Parsons
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?