Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. Haire et al
Plaintiff: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: MW Parrish, LLC, Addison Miles, LLC, Glen Haire, Ryan McDaniel and McDaniel Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00042
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER from proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl; Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/28/2019: Defendant Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2019. Plaintiff Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2019. Daubert & Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2020. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 7/1/2020. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 6/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 7/31/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: Counsel (DJT)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Greer, Todd)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 5/16/19: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 6/6/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/20/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME by Glen Haire (Braden, Roger)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Addison Miles, LLC, MW Parrish, LLC, Ryan McDaniel, McDaniel Enterprises, LLC. (Lee, Stephen)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Defendant Glen Haire d/b/a Twin Rivers Furnishings, LLC by Glen Haire. (Braden, Roger)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. Addison Miles, LLC served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Greer, Todd)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. Ryan McDaniel served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Greer, Todd)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. McDaniel Enterprises, LLC served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Greer, Todd)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. Glen Haire served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Greer, Todd)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. MW Parrish, LLC served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Greer, Todd)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 4/9/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Addison Miles, LLC, Glen Haire, MW Parrish, LLC, Ryan McDaniel, McDaniel Enterprises, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Glen Haire, #2 Summons as to McDaniel, #3 Summons as to McDaniel Enterprises, #4 Summons as to MW Parrish) (DJT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Crum and Forster Holdings Corp. for Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (DJT)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Addison Miles, LLC, Glen Haire, MW Parrish, LLC, Ryan McDaniel, McDaniel Enterprises, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2841748., filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. Haire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Parrish, LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison Miles, LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Haire
Represented By: Roger N. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McDaniel
Represented By: Stephen B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDaniel Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Todd P. Greer
Represented By: Raymond G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?