Brown v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Carl Brown
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00050
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441eb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (VanCleave, Buddy)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/1/19; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ian H. Morrison. cc: Counsel(DJT)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/1/19; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nathan P. Lusignan. cc: Counsel(DJT)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America re #14 MOTION for Ian H. Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2893108. (VanCleave, Buddy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America re #13 MOTION for Nathan P. Lusignan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2893101. (VanCleave, Buddy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Ian H. Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2893108. by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C Consent, #4 Exhibit D ECF Training) (VanCleave, Buddy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #5 Proposed Order) (DJT).
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Nathan P. Lusignan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2893101. by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Consent, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D ECF Training) (VanCleave, Buddy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #5 Proposed Order) (DJT).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 6/13/2019 granting #9 Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint. Count II of plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. cc: Counsel(JM)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER(EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 6/13/19: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 7/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/19/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (VanCleave, Buddy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COUNT II by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Joint MTD) (VanCleave, Buddy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (VanCleave, Buddy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (VanCleave, Buddy)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 5/23/19: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, shallhave through and including 6/13/2019 in which to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.cc: Counsel (DJT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Monhollen, Phillip)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 5/16/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (DJT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by The Prudential Insurance Company of America from Daviess Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00416. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2867230, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal filed with state court) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: Buddy J. VanCleave
Represented By: Nathan P. Lusignan
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Brown
Represented By: Sara Martin Diaz
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?