Carman v. Signature Healthcare, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anastasia Carman
Defendant: LP Calhoun, LLC, Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC and Signature Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00087
Filed: July 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION by Plaintiff Anastasia Carman (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ) (Foster, Mark)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Discovery / Motion for Discovery on Issues Relating to Enforcement of Purported Arbitration Agreement filed by LP Calhoun, LLC, Signature Healthcare, LLC, Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC. (Inman, J.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION by Defendants LP Calhoun, LLC, Signature Healthcare, LLC, Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit One: Curran Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order) (Inman, J.)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/20/19: Defendants have until 8/26/2019 to make their responsive filings. cc: Counsel (DJT)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery / Motion for Discovery on Issues Relating to Enforcement of Purported Arbitration Agreement by Plaintiff Anastasia Carman (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ) (Foster, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by LP Calhoun, LLC, Signature Healthcare, LLC, Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC. (Inman, J.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Constitutional Challenge by Anastasia Carman re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, (Foster, Mark)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anastasia Carman. LP Calhoun, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Foster, Mark)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anastasia Carman. Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Foster, Mark)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anastasia Carman. Signature Healthcare, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Foster, Mark)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 7/23/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LP Calhoun, LLC, Signature Healthcare, LLC, Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC, #2 Summons LP Calhoun, LLC) (DJT)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
July 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LP Calhoun, LLC, Signature Healthcare, LLC, Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2907236., filed by Anastasia Carman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Form of Sign-On Bonus Agreement, #3 Exhibit Form of Sign-On Bonus Agreement, #4 Exhibit Form of Sign-On Bonus Agreement, #5 Exhibit Defendants' Job Posting / Advertisement, #6 Exhibit Similar Job Posting / Advertisement by Defendants, #7 Exhibit Similar Job Posting / Advertisement by Defendants, #8 Exhibit Similar Job Posting / Advertisement by Defendants, #9 Exhibit Similar Job Posting / Advertisement by Defendants, #10 Exhibit Similar Job Posting / Advertisement by Defendants, #11 Exhibit Similar Job Posting / Advertisement by Defendants, #12 Exhibit Similar Job Posting / Advertisement by Defendants, #13 Exhibit Similar Job Posting / Advertisement by Defendants, #14 Exhibit Similar Job Posting / Advertisement by Defendants, #15 Exhibit Email from Defendants to Plaintiff, #16 Exhibit Job Position Description, #17 Exhibit Paystub, #18 Exhibit Paystub, #19 Exhibit Paystub, #20 Exhibit Paystub, #21 Exhibit Paystub, #22 Exhibit Paystub, #23 Exhibit Paystub, #24 Exhibit Paystub, #25 Exhibit Paystub, #26 Exhibit Paystub, #27 Exhibit Paystub, #28 Exhibit Paystub, #29 Exhibit Paystub, #30 Exhibit Paystub, #31 Exhibit Paystub Showing Payment of First Installment of Sign-On Bonus, #32 Exhibit Paystub Showing Payment of Second INstallment of Sign-On Bonus, #33 Exhibit Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan Summary, #34 Exhibit Onboarding Document, #35 Exhibit Onboarding Document, #36 Exhibit Onboarding Document, #37 Exhibit Mediation and Arbitration Agreement, #38 Exhibit Stakeholder Handbook (Employee Handbook), #39 Exhibit Stakeholder Handbook (Employee Handbook), #40 Exhibit Onboarding Document Summary, #41 Exhibit Consent of Plaintiff) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carman v. Signature Healthcare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Carman
Represented By: Mark N. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LP Calhoun, LLC
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?