Haire v. Commissioner of Social Security
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Louis Reid Haire
Case Number: 4:2019cv00096
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Appeals Council Action by Louis Reid Haire (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Appeals Council) (Wilkey, Russell)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Reid Haire (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Wilkey, Russell)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Reid Haire as to:Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Wilkey, Russell)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Reid Haire as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Wilkey, Russell)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 8/28/2019. (DJT)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General) (DJT)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. (DJT)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2919051, filed by Louis Reid Haire. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haire v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Louis Reid Haire
Represented By: Russell L. Wilkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?