Gooch v. Crete Carrier Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ryan D. Gooch
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation and Gordon E. Horton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00099
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446ml
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER from proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl; Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/23/2019: Defendant Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2020. Plaintiff Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2020. Daubert & Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2020. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 6/1/2020. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 4/30/2020. Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 9/27/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: Counsel (DJT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Crete Carrier Corporation, Gordon E. Horton. (Stopher, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/12/19: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 9/3/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/17/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Hopkins Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/9/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
August 9, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Crete Carrier Corporation, Gordon E. Horton. (DJT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crete Carrier Corporation. (DJT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Gordon E. Horton, Crete Carrier Corporation from Hopkins Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00389. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2920381, filed by Gordon E. Horton, Crete Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Horton & Crete's Answer) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooch v. Crete Carrier Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan D. Gooch
Represented By: Taryn K. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon E. Horton
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?