Tolson v. Daviess County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Todd Jason Tolson
Defendant: Daviess County Detention Center
Case Number: 4:2019cv00101
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING various documents by Todd Jason Tolson (Attachments: #1 envelope) (JM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Additional Claim) against Daviess County Detention Center, filed by Todd Jason Tolson. (DJT)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 9/10/19: Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to place this record (DN #7 -1) under seal.cc: Plaintiff(pro se) (DJT)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daviess County Detention Center, filed by Todd Jason Tolson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Summons) (DJT)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/22/19; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), however, Plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 under an installment plan. See McGore v. Wrigglesworth, 114 F.3d 601, 604 (6th Cir. 1997), overruled on other grounds by Jones v. Bock, 549 U.S. 199 (2007) (When an inmate seeks pauper status, the only issue is whether the inmate pays the entire fee at the initiation of the proceeding or over a period of time under an installment plan.). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. cc: Plaintiff(pro se), Finance, DCDC (DJT)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Todd Jason Tolson. (DJT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Pri. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/16/2019. (DJT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Todd Jason Tolson (DJT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daviess County Detention Center, filed by Todd Jason Tolson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons) (DJT) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/22/2019 to add signature page to Complaint) (DJT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolson v. Daviess County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daviess County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Jason Tolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?