Kentucky Wesleyan College v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Plaintiff: Kentucky Wesleyan College
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00124
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Chapin E. Scheumann on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Scheumann, Chapin)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/23/2019: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/27/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.cc: counsel, KL (JM)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Maloney, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Proof of Service of Process by Kentucky Wesleyan College (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service with Receipt for Certified Mail) (Young, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 9/11/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2940970., filed by Kentucky Wesleyan College. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kentucky Wesleyan College v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky Wesleyan College
Represented By: John A. Sowell
Represented By: Robert Arthur Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Chapin E. Scheumann
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?