Shaffer v. Daviess County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Brandi Shaffer
Defendant: Arthur Maglinger, Lorrin Mix, Ohio County Detention Center Medical Contractor, Gerry Wright, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Chad Payne, Daviess County Detention Center Medical Director, Ohio County Detention Center Medical Director, Daviess County, Kentucky, Ohio County Detention Center Nurse Who Performed Initial Screening, Daviess County Detention Center APRN, Ohio County Detention Center APRN, Ohio County, Kentucky, Cristy Daugherty and Ohio County Detention Center Nurse
Case Number: 4:2019cv00133
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 bv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Health Partners, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Southern Health Partners, Inc., Daviess County Detention Center Medical Director, and Lorrin Mix (Brannon, Margaret) Modified text on 11/26/2019 (EAS).
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING re: representation by Brandi Shaffer (Rhoads, Christopher) Modified docket text on 10/15/2019 (DJT).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/1/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cristy Daugherty, Daviess County Detention Center APRN, Daviess County Detention Center Medical Director, Daviess County, Kentucky, Arthur Maglinger, Lorrin Mix, Ohio County Detention Center APRN, Ohio County Detention Center Medical Contractor, Ohio County Detention Center Medical Director, Ohio County Detention Center Nurse Who Performed Initial Screening, Ohio County, Kentucky, Chad Payne, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Gerry Wright. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Wright, #2 Summons as to Daugherty, #3 Summons as to SHP, #4 Summons as to Payne, #5 Summons as to OCDC Nurse, #6 Summons as to OCDC APRN, #7 Summons as to OCDC Medical Director, #8 Summons as to Mix, #9 Summons as to OCDC Medical Contractor, #10 Summons as to Maglinger, #11 Summons as to Daviess County, #12 Summons as to DCDC APRN, #13 Summons as to DCDC Medical Director) (DJT)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cristy Daugherty, Daviess County Detention Center APRN, Daviess County Detention Center Medical Director, Daviess County, Kentucky, Arthur Maglinger, Lorrin Mix, Ohio County Detention Center APRN, Ohio County Detention Center Medical Contractor, Ohio County Detention Center Medical Director, Ohio County Detention Center Nurse Who Performed Initial Screening, Ohio County, Kentucky, Chad Payne, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Gerry Wright Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2954514., filed by Brandi Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaffer v. Daviess County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Maglinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorrin Mix
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Robert F. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio County Detention Center Medical Contractor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Robert F. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daviess County Detention Center Medical Director
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Robert F. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio County Detention Center Medical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daviess County, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio County Detention Center Nurse Who Performed Initial Screening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daviess County Detention Center APRN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio County Detention Center APRN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio County, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristy Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio County Detention Center Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Shaffer
Represented By: Aaron J. Bentley
Represented By: Camille A. Bathurst
Represented By: Gregory A. Belzley
Represented By: Katherine H. Reardon
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?