Anderson v. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ronald Anderson
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00140
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/3/19; granting #5 Stipulation and Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant's responsive pleading deadline is 1/3/2020 cc: Counsel(DJT)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint And Agreed Order by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William) Modified event type on 12/5/2019 (DJT).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/17/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). ** ATTESTED COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL THIS DATE ** (Attachments: #1 Summons as to KY Sec of State) (DJT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2965057., filed by Ronald Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Anderson
Represented By: Sara Martin Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?