United States of America v. King et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Discover Bank, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Michael King and Essie King
Case Number: 4:2019cv00172
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Discover Bank. (Stinnett, W.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Essie King served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Campbell, William)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Discover Bank served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Campbell, William)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Michael King served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Campbell, William)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 12/2/2019: This action is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, K. Lovell (EAS)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Discover Bank, Essie King, and Michael King. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (MNM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Discover Bank, Essie King, and Michael King, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Judgment Lien, #5 Exhibit E - Judgment Lien, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: W. Scott Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?