United States of America et al v. Executive Health Resources, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: M.D., M.P.H Jesse Polansky, United States of America and Jesse Polansky
Defendant: Executive Health Resources, Inc., et al
In Re: Subpoena to Non-Party Owensboro Health Regional Hospital
Case Number: 4:2019mc00002
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/8/2019 granting #11 Motion for William T. Jacks to appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: counsel (JM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/8/19: In light of Relator Dr. Jesse Polansky's Notice of Withdrawal, Relator's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents against Owensboro Health Regional Hospital is DISMISSED. cc: Counsel (DJT)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jesse Polansky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Walker, Chad)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for William T. Jacks to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125 (receipt #L33060890) by Plaintiff Jesse Polansky. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (JM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Gregory R. Booker re #1 Motion to Compel.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/19/2019. (KJA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John E. Riley re #1 Motion to Compel.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/19/2019. (KJA)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/31/2019 granting #4 Motion for Attorney Chad B. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/30/2019: This action is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, K. Lovell (EAS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to William T. Jacks re #1 Motion to Compel.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/12/2019. (KJA)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Thomas M. Melsheimer re #1 Motion to Compel.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/12/2019. (KJA)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Chad B. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125. by Plaintiff Jesse Polansky (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (DJT)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Jesse Polansky re #1 MOTION to Compel (DJT)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiff Jesse Polansky (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - to Subpoena Duces Tecum, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Amended Third Party Subpoena, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Third Party Subpoena, #5 Exhibit D - Non-Party Owensboro Health Regional Hospital's Response and Objections, #6 Exhibit E - ORDER, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Third Party Subpoena, #8 Exhibit G - Protective Order, #9 Memorandum in Support, #10 Proposed Order) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Executive Health Resources, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Health Resources, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D., M.P.H Jesse Polansky
Represented By: Thomas M. Melsheimer
Represented By: William T. Jacks
Represented By: Chad B. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Polansky
Represented By: Thomas M. Melsheimer
Represented By: William T. Jacks
Represented By: Chad B. Walker
Represented By: Gregory R. Booker
Represented By: John E. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Subpoena to Non-Party Owensboro Health Regional Hospital
Represented By: Christopher A. Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?