Southard v. Countrymark Energy Resources, LLC
Plaintiff: Jerry Southard
Defendant: Countrymark Energy Resources, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00041
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER from proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl; Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/17/2020: Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2021. Daubert & Dispositive Motions due by 8/6/2021. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 3/19/2021. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 1/15/2021. Pretrial Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 6/15/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc:counsel (DJT)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to the Hopkins Circuit Court by Plaintiff Jerry Southard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Verified Stipulation, #2 Exhibit "B" Oil and Gas Lease, #3 Exhibit "C: Oil and Gas Lease Assignment, #4 Proposed Order) (Springer, Thomas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Countrymark Energy Resources, LLC. (Stainback, Frank)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/6/20: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 3/27/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/10/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/6/20: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 3/27/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/10/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: Counsel, CM- HBB (DJT)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Hopkins Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/5/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
March 5, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Countrymark Energy Resources, LLC. (DJT)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Countrymark Energy Resources, LLC from Hopkins Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00085. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3058563, filed by Countrymark Energy Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and all processed pleadings, #3 Exhibit 2 - April 4, 2019 Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Jacob Hancock, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing of Removal) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southard v. Countrymark Energy Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrymark Energy Resources, LLC
Represented By: Frank Stainback, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan R. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Southard
Represented By: Thomas E. Springer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?