Sims-Madison v. Dana Commercial Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Johnnie Sims-Madison
Defendant: United Steel Workers of America Local 9443-2 and Dana Commercial Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00071
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United Steel Workers of America Local 9443-2. (Priddy, Alton)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Johnnie Sims-Madison. (Dannelly, Devan)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant United Steel Workers of America Local 9443-2 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Dismissing) (Priddy, Alton)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Dana Commercial Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC. (Dershaw, Brian)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Daviess Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal (DJT)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 5/7/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Dana Commercial Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC, United Steel Workers of America Local 9443-2 from Daviess Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00413. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3097702, filed by Dana Commercial Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC, United Steel Workers of America Local 9443-2. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Summons to USW of America, #5 Exhibit Summons to Dana Commercial Vehicle Mfg) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims-Madison v. Dana Commercial Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Sims-Madison
Represented By: Devan A. Dannelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel Workers of America Local 9443-2
Represented By: Alton D. Priddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Commercial Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Brian G. Dershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?