Carter v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Renee Carter
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic Minimed, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00118
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,, by Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Sullivan, R.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Renee Carter. All Plaintiffs. (Conway, A.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Renee Carter. All Plaintiffs. (Conway, A.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Medtronic Minimed) (DJT)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., filed by Dawn Renee Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1,Order of Appointment, #2 Exhibit #2, Premarket Approval, #3 Exhibit #3, Summary of Safety & Effectiveness, #4 Exhibit #4, System User Guide, #5 Exhibit #5, 9.2.2018 Notification, #6 Exhibit #6, Class II, Device Recall, #7 Exhibit #7, Letter 08.05.2019, #8 Exhibit #8, 11.21.2019 Urgent Field Safety, #9 Exhibit #9, Class I Device Recall, #10 Exhibit #10, Recall MiniMed Insulin Pumps, #11 Exhibit #11, Letter 09.28.2016 ) (DJT)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/24/20 ;granting #13 Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint. cc: Counsel(DJT)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #13 MOTION for Leave to filed Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) by Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Sullivan, R.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to filed Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Dawn Renee Carter (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit #1,Order of Appointment, #5 Exhibit #2, Premarket Approval, #6 Exhibit #3, Summary of Safety & Effectiveness, #7 Exhibit #4, System User Guide, #8 Exhibit #5, 9.2.2018 Notification, #9 Exhibit #6, Class II, Device Recall, #10 Exhibit #7, Letter 08.05.2019, #11 Exhibit #8, 11.21.2019 Urgent Field Safety, #12 Exhibit #9, Class I Device Recall, #13 Exhibit #10, Recall MiniMed Insulin Pumps, #14 Exhibit #11, Letter 09.28.2016, #15 Summons Summons to Defendant, Medtronic, Inc., #16 Summons Summons to Defendant, Medtronic MiniMed, Inc.) (Conway, A.)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/4/20; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas R. Pack. cc: Counsel(DJT)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/4/20; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nicole E. Narotzky. cc: Counsel(DJT)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/3/20; granting #9 Proposed Agreed Order: Defendants shall have thirty (30) days from service of the Amended Complaint on them to serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. cc: Counsel(DJT)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order for extension to time to respond to Amended Complaint by Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Sullivan, R.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Thomas Pack to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3149442. by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration, #3 Proposed Order) (Sullivan, R.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Nicole Narotzky to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3149393. by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration, #3 Proposed Order) (Sullivan, R.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Thomas Pack re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/14/2020. (KJA)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Nicole Narotzky re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/14/2020. (KJA)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Union Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/24/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. from Union Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00076. Filing fee $ 400 ; receipt number 0644-3146832, filed by Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Record of Service on 7-10, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Renee Carter
Represented By: Stephen H. Thomas
Represented By: A. V. Conway, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Pack
Represented By: R. Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Nicole Narotzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Minimed, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Pack
Represented By: R. Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Nicole Narotzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?