City of Hawesville, Kentucky v. Great American Insurance Agency, Inc.
Plaintiff: City of Hawesville, Kentucky
Defendant: Great American Insurance Agency, Inc. doing business as Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00135
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order concerning correct name of defendant by City of Hawesville, Kentucky. (Sullivan, R.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by City of Hawesville, Kentucky. (Sullivan, R.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Bifurcate Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 42 by Defendant Great American Insurance Agency, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Bifurcate, #2 Proposed Order on Motion to Bifurcate) (Zipperle, Gene)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 9/2/20: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 9/23/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Great American Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Zipperle, Gene)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Hancock Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/14/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Great American Insurance Agency, Inc. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. for Great American Insurance Agency, Inc.. (DJT)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Great American Insurance Agency, Inc. from Hancock Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00061. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3162510, filed by Great American Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint/Summons) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Hawesville, Kentucky v. Great American Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Hawesville, Kentucky
Represented By: R. Michael Sullivan
Represented By: L. Christopher Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Agency, Inc. doing business as Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Gene F. Zipperle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?